+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On December 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY