+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 52
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 661-662
- Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to INSURANCE
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 96-97
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 24, 2020: House Floor Vote: SB 595 PN 1722, FP
January 29, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 595 PN 1396, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor