+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 570
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
June 3, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 594 PN 587, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor