+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMERCE
On July 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
+ − Vote
July 8, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 590 PN 668, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor