+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 42 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 689-690
- Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY