+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 130
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (187-0)
On October 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
On October 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page ....
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 382
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 367
- Amended on third consideration
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
October 17, 2018: House Floor Vote: SB 554 PN 2054, FP
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 554 PN 2054, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
October 1, 2018: House Floor Vote: SB 554 PN 1823, 2017 A7390, MARSICO
April 25, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 554 PN 740, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor