+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 939-940
- Third consideration and final passage (34-15)
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT