+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 17, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 536 PN 859, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor