+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 615-616
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 22, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 532 PN 1187, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor