+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 502 PN 1552, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor