+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (26-23)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1075
- In the House
On October 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1057
- Amended on third consideration
On September 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 446
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 244
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (6)
October 14, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 501 PN 1315, FINAL PASSAGE
October 13, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 501 PN 497, A3594, RAFFERTY AMENDMENT NO. A-3594 TO EICHELBERGER AMENDMENT NO. A-3592
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor