+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE