+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 12 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2021: House Floor Vote: SB 49 PN 31, FP
February 5, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 49 PN 31, Final Passage
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor