+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 221
- Third consideration and final passage (45-0)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
March 25, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 49 PN 95, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor