+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 8
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (178-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 479 PN 437, FP
June 10, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 479 PN 437, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor