+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On September 19, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 927-928
- Third consideration and final passage (30-19)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
September 21, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 461 PN 469, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor