+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1517
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 10
- Approved by the Governor
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On November 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (4)
January 27, 2014: House Floor Vote: SB 437 PN 1241, FP
June 19, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 437 PN 1241, FINAL PASSAGE
March 19, 2013: Senate Education Vote: Senate Bill 437 - Reported as Amended
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor