+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 586-587
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 10, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 430 PN 1719, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor