+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 60 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1128-1129
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 694-695
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: SB 416 PN 910, FP
June 16, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 416 PN 910, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor