+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1123
- Third consideration and final passage (46-0)
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1113
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1087
- Amended on second consideration
On October 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (3)
October 21, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 411 PN 1335, FINAL PASSAGE
October 19, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 411 PN 1154, A3552, PILEGGI AMENDMENT NO. A-3552
October 19, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 411 PN 1154, A3663, BROOKS AMENDMENT NO. A-3663
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor