+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 79
- Approved by the Governor
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On December 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
On December 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
On December 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (178-11)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
December 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: SB 398 PN 312, FP
June 23, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 398 PN 312, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor