+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 430-431
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 27, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: SB 377 PN 1401, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor