+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (46-0)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT