+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 86
- Approved by the Governor
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1855
- House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate
On October 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On October 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage
- In the Senate
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1752
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
October 23, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 358 PN 1516, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS
October 23, 2013: House Rules Vote: Senate Bill 358 - Report Bill As Committed
October 23, 2013: House Floor Vote: SB 358 PN 1516, CONCUR
October 22, 2013: Senate Rules And Executive Nominations Vote: Senate Bill 358 - Re-Reported as Amended
October 21, 2013: House Appropriations Vote: Senate Bill 358 - Re-report Bill As Committed
October 21, 2013: House Floor Vote: SB 358 PN 1496, FP
October 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: SB 358 PN 1448, 2013 A3960, CUTLER
October 2, 2013: House Health Vote: Senate Bill 358 - Report Bill As Amended
October 2, 2013: House Health Vote: Senate Bill 358 - Adopt Amendment A03709
June 18, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 358 PN 281, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor