+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 61
- Approved by the Governor
On July 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 673
- Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING