+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 11A
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1021
- Third consideration and final passage (171-14)
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- Removed from table
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
October 25, 2017: House Floor Vote: SB 325 PN 1021, FP
June 30, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 325 PN 1021, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor