+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On November 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 108
- Approved by the Governor
On November 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (185-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 595
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Votes (2)
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 314 PN 292, FP
June 12, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 314 PN 292, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor