+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 657
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 625
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 563
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 513-514
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 250-251
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 227
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor