+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY