+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 16
- Approved by the Governor
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 635
- House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (149-46)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 333
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate amended House amendments
- Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (42-7)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 312
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 354
- Third consideration and final passage (149-43)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 274
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 216
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 125
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 84
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 64
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 42
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1417
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with request to re-refer to RULES
- Re-referred to RULES
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 485
- Third consideration and final passage (40-7)
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 470
- Amended on third consideration
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 101
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (55)
April 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 1690, CONCUR
March 16, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 1609, FP
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6126, WHEATLEY
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6056, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6031, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A4391, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6080, HEFFLEY
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6078, MILLER, B.
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6069, DUSH
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6070, DUSH
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6073, DUSH
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6020, CORBIN
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6063, LAWRENCE
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6066, LAWRENCE
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6063, MOT RECON, O'NEILL
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6063, LAWRENCE
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6004, GAINEY
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6128, HELM
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6121, WHEATLEY
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6120, WHEATLEY
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6000, DAVIDSON
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6054, MOT RECON, DALEY, M.
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6054, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6110, MOT RECON, DALEY, M.
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6047, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6050, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6036, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6039, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6055, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6030, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6108, PETRI
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6087, PETRI
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6051, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6052, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6041, BAKER
March 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6049, BAKER
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5980, SUSP RULES, MARSICO
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6072, MENTZER
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6007, PETRI
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5934, DIAMOND
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5980, MARSICO
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5958, DIAMOND
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6110, EVANKOVICH
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6054, BAKER
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5835, MARSICO
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5934, SUSP RULES, DIAMOND
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A6007, SUSP RULES, PETRI
March 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, 2015 A5849, PETRARCA
May 12, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 3 PN 889, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor