+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 690
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Vote
June 23, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 299 PN 1045, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor