+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 62
- Approved by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (45-0)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 298 PN 260, FP
March 27, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 298 PN 260, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor