+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 20
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 504
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2017: House Floor Vote: SB 288 PN 274, FP
May 22, 2017: Senate Floor Vote: SB 288 PN 274, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor