+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 3A of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1157-1159
- Third consideration and final passage (150-51)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1097-1099
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (45-5)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (3)
June 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: SB 266 PN 243, FP
June 24, 2021: House Floor Vote: SB 266 PN 243, 2021 A2106, SUSP RULES, COX
June 16, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 266 PN 243, Final Passage
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor