+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 593-594
- Third consideration and final passage (44-6)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 290
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 12, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 25 PN 507, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor