+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 527
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
May 25, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 243 PN 688, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor