+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 30
- Approved by the Governor
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (163-28)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMERCE
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 68-69
- Third consideration and final passage (42-8)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2018: House Floor Vote: SB 234 PN 1443, FP
January 30, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: SB 234 PN 1443, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor