+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1005
- Third consideration and final passage
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
+ − Votes (3)
October 2, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: SB 22 PN 1386, FINAL PASSAGE
September 24, 2013: Senate Aging And Youth Vote: Senate Bill 22 - Reported as Amended
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor