+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Vote by Electorate, See History, Section "O"
- Approved by the Electorate
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 441
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Sessions of 2020 and 2021
- Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 1 of 2021
- Filed in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 169-176
- Third consideration and final passage (116-86)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 157-159
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 93-110
- Third consideration and final passage (28-20)
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 51
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: House Floor Vote: SB 2 PN 86, FP
January 26, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 2 PN 86, 2021 A199, BOSCOLA Amendment No. A-0199
January 26, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 2 PN 86, 2021 A186, Motion to Table BOSCOLA Amendment No. A-0186
January 26, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: SB 2 PN 86, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor