+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On November 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-1)
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
November 17, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: SB 146 PN 93, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor