+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act No. 18
- Approved by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1427-1428
- House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (197-0)
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 277
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 144 PN 1078, CONCUR
June 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: SB 144 PN 927, FP
April 9, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 144 PN 340, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor