+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
On September 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (31-17)
- In the House
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 463
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 4, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: SB 139 PN 851, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor