+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2123
- Re-reported as amended
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 11, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1383 PN 2123, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor