+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On September 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 2221
- Third consideration and final passage
On September 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On September 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
September 24, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1373 PN 2052, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor