+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to COMMERCE
On September 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On September 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE