+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES