+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended on third consideration
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
October 26, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1317 PN 2008, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor