+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 94 of 2022
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On July 6, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-1)
On July 1, 2022 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 20, 2022 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to INSURANCE
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
July 6, 2022: House Floor Vote: SB 1235 PN 1649, FP
June 8, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1235 PN 1649, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor