+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to INSURANCE
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
October 19, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1225 PN 1932, Final Passage
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor