+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On September 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On September 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
September 28, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: SB 1212 PN 2058, FINAL PASSAGE
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor